Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/19/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 09/19/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/19/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 09/19/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 09/19/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/21/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/21/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/21/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/21/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/21/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/21/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/25/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/25/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/25/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/25/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/26/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/03/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/03/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/03/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/03/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/03/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/05/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/05/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/05/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/05/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/05/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/05/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/05/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/05/2000