Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/12/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/12/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 10/12/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/12/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/17/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/17/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/17/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/17/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/17/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/17/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/17/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/17/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/17/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/17/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/17/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/17/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 10/17/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/17/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 10/17/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/17/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/17/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/17/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 10/17/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/17/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/17/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/17/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/17/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/17/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/17/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/17/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/17/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/17/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/17/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/17/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/17/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/17/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/17/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/17/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/17/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/17/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/17/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/17/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/18/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/18/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/18/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/18/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/18/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/18/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/18/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/18/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/18/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/18/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/18/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/18/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/18/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/18/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/18/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/18/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/18/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 10/18/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/18/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/18/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/18/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/18/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/18/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/18/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/18/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/18/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/18/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/18/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/18/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/18/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/18/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/19/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/19/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/19/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 10/19/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/19/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/19/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/19/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/19/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/19/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/23/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/23/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/23/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/23/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/23/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/23/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/24/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/24/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/24/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/24/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/24/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/24/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/24/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/24/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/24/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/24/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/25/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/25/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew