Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/25/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/15/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/15/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/15/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/15/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/15/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/15/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/15/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/15/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/15/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/15/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/15/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/15/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/15/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/28/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/12/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/12/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/15/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/15/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/15/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/15/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/15/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/15/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/15/1999