Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/12/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/12/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/05/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 05/05/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/05/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/05/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/07/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/07/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/07/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/07/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/07/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/08/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/08/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/08/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/08/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/10/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/10/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/14/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/14/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/14/2000