Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/25/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/25/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/25/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/25/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/12/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/14/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/27/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/19/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/19/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/07/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/09/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/15/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/15/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/22/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/22/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/29/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 08/02/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/13/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/30/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 11/01/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/01/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/01/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/04/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/04/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 11/04/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/04/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 11/10/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/10/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/10/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 01/27/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 01/27/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/31/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/31/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/31/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/01/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/07/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/22/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/03/2000