Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/13/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/13/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/13/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/13/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/13/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/13/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/13/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/13/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/13/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/13/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/13/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/27/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/27/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/27/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/27/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/27/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/27/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/27/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/27/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/27/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/27/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/27/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/27/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/27/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/06/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/06/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/06/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/06/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/20/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/20/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/20/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/20/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/20/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/29/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/29/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/29/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/14/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/20/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/20/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/20/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/20/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/18/1999