Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/21/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/21/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/21/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/08/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/14/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/14/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/22/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/22/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/22/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/22/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/28/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/28/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/28/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/30/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/30/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/30/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/30/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/30/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/30/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/30/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/30/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/30/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/30/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/07/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/07/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/14/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 10/14/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/14/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/14/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/19/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/19/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/04/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/05/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/09/1999