Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/04/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/06/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/11/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/18/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/26/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/26/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/07/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/07/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/15/1999