Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/02/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/02/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/11/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/11/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 02/11/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/11/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/11/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/11/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/11/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/11/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 02/24/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/24/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/24/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/02/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/04/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/05/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/04/2000