Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/08/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/08/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/08/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/08/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/08/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/08/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 06/08/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/08/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/15/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/10/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/10/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/10/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/10/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/11/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/11/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/11/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/11/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/11/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/11/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/11/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/11/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 07/25/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/25/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/25/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/25/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/25/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/25/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/25/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/25/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/25/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/25/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/25/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/25/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/25/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/20/2000