Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
11/09/2000 Became Public Law No: 106-483.
11/09/2000 Signed by President.
11/02/2000 Presented to President.
10/30/2000 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H11581-11583; text: CR H11581-11582)
10/26/2000 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.
10/26/2000 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11187-11188)
09/12/2000 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7455-7456)
06/14/2000 Introduced in House