Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/15/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/15/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/20/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/29/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/29/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/29/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/17/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/17/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/18/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 09/07/2000