Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/15/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/20/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/29/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/17/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/17/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/18/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/18/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2000