Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/15/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/15/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/21/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/29/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/10/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/18/2000