Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/14/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/15/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/20/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/29/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/29/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/29/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/29/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/29/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/29/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/29/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 06/29/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/29/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/29/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/10/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/17/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/17/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/17/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/17/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/17/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/17/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/17/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/07/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/07/2000