Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/15/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/15/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/15/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/15/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/15/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/15/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/15/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/15/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/15/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/15/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/15/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/15/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/15/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/20/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/20/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/20/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/21/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/23/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/23/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/27/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/27/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/27/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/28/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/28/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/29/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/29/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/29/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/10/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/10/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/18/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/18/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/18/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/18/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/18/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/18/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/18/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 07/18/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/24/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 09/07/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/07/2000