Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/02/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/06/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/16/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 08/03/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/03/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew