Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 02/03/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 02/03/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/04/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/04/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/23/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/23/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/23/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/23/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/23/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/26/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/11/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/18/2000