Text: H.J.Res.22 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/1999)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF.

 
[Congressional Bills 106th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.J. Res. 22 Introduced in House (IH)]







106th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. J. RES. 22

            To commemorate the birthday of Cesar E. Chavez.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            February 3, 1999

  Mr. Filner (for himself, Ms. Roybal-Allard, Ms. Pelosi, Mr. Romero-
  Barcelo, Mr. Olver, Mr. Faleomavaega, Ms. DeLauro, Mrs. Capps, Mr. 
McDermott, Mr. Sanders, Mr. Owens, Mr. Green of Texas, Mr. Clyburn, Mr. 
 Kucinich, Mr. Pastor, Mr. Rangel, Mr. Frost, Mr. Berman, Ms. Norton, 
    Ms. Kilpatrick, Mr. Menendez, Mrs. Mink of Hawaii, Mr. Brown of 
   California, Mr. Reyes, Mr. Martinez, Mr. Gutierrez, Mrs. Meek of 
Florida, Mr. Becerra, Mr. Ortiz, Mr. Stark, Mr. Underwood, Ms. Woolsey, 
Ms. Sanchez, Mr. Hinchey, Mr. Serrano, Ms. Lofgren, Mr. Rodriguez, Mr. 
Hilliard, Mr. Hinojosa, Mr. Jackson of Illinois, Mr. Davis of Illinois, 
Mr. Kennedy of Rhode Island, Ms. Millender-McDonald, Mr. Gonzalez, Ms. 
    Velazquez, and Mrs. Napolitano) introduced the following joint 
  resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Government Reform

_______________________________________________________________________

                            JOINT RESOLUTION


 
            To commemorate the birthday of Cesar E. Chavez.

Whereas Cesar E. Chavez was born March 31, 1927, on a small farm near Yuma, 
        Arizona, and died on April 23, 1993;
Whereas numerous holidays, schools, parks, libraries, and other structures and 
        events have been named after Cesar E. Chavez, internationally and in 
        California, New York, Michigan, Indiana, Oklahoma, Arizona, Illinois, 
        Minnesota, Colorado, New Mexico, Massachusetts, Texas, and Hawaii, with 
        many more planned;
Whereas Cesar E. Chavez was a recipient of the Martin Luther King, Jr., Peace 
        Prize during his lifetime and was awarded the Presidential Medal of 
        Freedom by President Clinton on August 8, 1994;
Whereas, the grandson of a Mexican immigrant and settler, he grew up working 
        with migrant farm workers, himself picking grapes, melons, beans, and 
        other staple crops at low wages and for long hours, during which time he 
        developed a strong work ethic and respect for the farm workers his 
        father called ``the children of God'';
Whereas at the age of 18 Cesar E. Chavez entered the United States Navy and 
        served his country with distinction for 2 years;
Whereas, as early as 1949, Cesar E. Chavez committed himself to organizing farm 
        workers to campaign for safe and fair working conditions, reasonable 
        wages, decent housing, and the outlawing of child labor;
Whereas in 1962 Cesar E. Chavez founded the National Farm Workers Association, 
        predecessor of the United Farm Workers of America, which brought hope to 
        farm workers that they might one day realize the basic protections and 
        workers' rights to which all Americans aspire;
Whereas, through his commitment to nonviolence, Cesar E. Chavez brought dignity 
        and respect to the farm workers who organized themselves, and became an 
        inspiration and a resource to other Americans and people engaged in 
        human rights struggles throughout the world;
Whereas Cesar E. Chavez was an advocate for nonviolence at a time when violence 
        penetrated every level of our society;
Whereas Cesar E. Chavez and his family also dedicated themselves to the 
        education of farm workers' children through migrant schools, many of 
        whom graduated and worked as teachers, doctors, nurses, and in other 
        professional occupations;
Whereas the legacy of Cesar E. Chavez includes healthy working conditions that 
        yield uncontaminated food for America's tables and the enforcement of 
        employer sanctions for those who hire illegal immigrants;
Whereas Cesar E. Chavez's influence extends far beyond agriculture and provides 
        inspiration for those working to better human rights through his example 
        of organizing voter registration drives in urban and farm areas, 
        initiating complaints against mistreatment by police and welfare 
        officials, and empowering everyday workers to seek advancement in 
        education and politics; and
Whereas Cesar E. Chavez lived alongside his campesino brothers and sisters in 
        humble surroundings and upon his passing was laid to rest where he lived 
        and worked for 23 years on the grounds of the headquarters of the United 
        Farm Workers of America, known as Nuestra Senora de La Paz (Our Lady of 
        Peace), located in the Tehachapi Mountains at Keene, California: Now, 
        therefore, be it
    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled, That Cesar E. Chavez be 
honored for his tireless commitment to improve the plight of farm 
workers and the poor throughout the United States and for the 
inspiration his heroic efforts gave to so many Americans to work 
nonviolently for justice in their communities and that a Federal 
holiday be recognized throughout the United States, and that all 
Americans be encouraged to commit themselves to working for justice 
through nonviolence in their communities and remind themselves of the 
work of the people who put food on the tables of America.
                                 &lt;all&gt;