Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/01/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/01/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/01/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 03/01/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/01/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/01/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/01/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/01/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/01/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/01/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/01/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/01/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/01/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/01/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/01/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/01/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/01/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/01/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/01/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/01/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/01/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/01/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/01/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/01/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/04/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/04/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/04/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/04/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/04/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/04/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/04/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/04/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/04/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/04/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/04/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/04/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/04/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/11/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/11/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/11/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/18/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/18/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/18/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/25/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/25/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/25/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/25/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/25/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 04/12/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/12/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/15/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/15/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/29/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/29/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/29/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/29/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/13/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/13/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/06/1999