There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relative to equal rights for men and women.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/24/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/31/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/24/1999Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (152)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/13/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/13/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/13/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 04/13/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/13/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/13/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/13/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/13/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/13/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/13/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/20/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/20/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/20/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/20/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/27/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/18/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/18/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/26/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/14/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/14/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/23/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/23/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/14/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/14/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/14/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/14/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/14/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/14/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/14/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/14/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/14/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/14/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/14/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/14/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/14/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/14/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/14/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/14/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/14/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/14/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/14/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/14/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/14/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/14/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/14/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/14/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/14/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/14/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/14/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/14/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/14/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/14/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/14/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/14/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/14/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/14/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/14/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/14/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/14/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/14/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/14/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/14/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/14/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/21/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/21/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/21/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/21/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/22/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/22/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/22/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/22/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/22/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/29/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/09/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/09/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/09/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/13/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/28/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/24/1999 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution03/31/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.41.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.41. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/24/1999)

Constitutional Amendment - Declares that equality of rights under the law shall not be denied or abridged by the United States or any State on account of sex.