Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/13/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/13/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/13/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 04/13/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/13/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/13/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/13/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/13/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/13/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/13/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/20/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/20/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/20/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/20/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/27/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/18/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/18/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/26/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/14/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/14/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/23/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/23/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/14/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/14/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/14/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/14/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/14/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/14/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/14/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/14/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/14/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/14/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/14/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/14/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/14/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/14/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/14/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/14/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/14/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/14/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/14/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/14/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/14/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/14/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/14/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/14/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/14/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/14/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/14/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/14/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/14/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/14/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/14/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/14/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/14/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/14/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/14/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/14/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/14/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/14/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/14/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/14/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/14/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/21/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/21/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/21/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/21/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/22/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/22/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/22/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/22/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/22/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/29/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/09/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/09/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/09/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/13/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/28/2000