Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/25/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/25/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/08/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/15/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/15/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/15/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/15/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/15/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/15/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/15/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/15/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/19/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/19/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/19/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/12/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/12/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/12/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/14/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/14/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/14/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/14/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/14/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/14/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/14/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/14/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/14/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/14/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/14/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 10/14/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/14/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/14/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/14/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/14/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/18/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/18/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/18/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/18/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/18/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/18/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/18/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/18/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/18/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/18/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 10/18/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/25/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/25/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/25/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/25/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/27/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/28/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/28/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/28/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/28/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/28/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/01/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/01/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/01/1999