Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/28/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/05/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/05/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/05/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/05/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/11/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/11/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/11/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/11/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/13/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/13/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/13/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/19/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/19/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/19/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/19/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/19/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/19/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/19/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/25/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/08/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/15/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/15/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/14/2000