There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress with respect to the court-martial conviction of the late Rear Admiral Charles Butler McVay, III, and calling upon the President to award a Presidental Unit Citation to the final crew of the U.S.S. INDIANAPOLIS.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/28/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/14/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/14/1999Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/28/1999Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/19/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/19/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/19/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/09/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/09/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/09/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/09/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/09/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/09/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/09/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/30/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/30/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/30/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/19/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/19/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/19/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/19/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/19/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/19/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/19/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/14/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/24/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/24/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/24/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/24/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/24/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/24/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/24/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/24/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/27/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/27/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/07/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/07/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 11/02/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/02/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/24/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/24/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/06/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/11/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/18/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/19/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/20/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/26/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/03/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/17/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/27/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/13/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/28/1999 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel05/14/1999 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.48. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/1999)

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the court-martial charges against then-Captain Charles McVay, U.S. Navy, arising from the sinking of the USS INDIANAPOLIS on July 30, 1945, while under his command were not morally sustainable; (2) Captain McVay's conviction was a miscarriage of justice; (3) the American people should now recognize Captain McVay's lack of culpability for the loss of such ship and the lives of the men who died as the result of her sinking; and (4) the President should award a Unit Citation to the final crew of the INDIANAPOLIS in recognition of their courage and fortitude in the face of tremendous hardship and adversity after their ship was torpedoed and sunk.