Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/19/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/19/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/19/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/09/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/09/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/09/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/09/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/09/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/09/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/09/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/30/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/30/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/30/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/19/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/19/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/19/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/19/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/19/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/19/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/19/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/14/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/24/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/24/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/24/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/24/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/24/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/24/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/24/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/24/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/27/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/27/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/07/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/07/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 11/02/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/02/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/24/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/24/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/06/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/11/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/18/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/19/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/20/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/26/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/03/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/17/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/27/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/13/2000