Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/12/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/12/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/12/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/12/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/12/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/20/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/20/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/24/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/24/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/28/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/28/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/28/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/28/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/28/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/28/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/28/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/28/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/28/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/28/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/28/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/06/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/06/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/06/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/06/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/06/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/19/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/26/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/27/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/02/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/02/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/02/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/09/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/16/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/17/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/24/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/02/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/14/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/21/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/13/2000