Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/26/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/27/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/07/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/07/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/07/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/08/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/09/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/10/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/10/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/10/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/15/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/16/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/16/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/17/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/17/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/22/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/23/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/23/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/23/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/24/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/24/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/01/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/12/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/12/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/12/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/20/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/21/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/21/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/21/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/27/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 08/02/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/08/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/27/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/28/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/06/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 11/03/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/17/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/18/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 03/02/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/14/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/22/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/17/2000