Text: H.J.Res.62 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 106-90 (11/08/1999)

 
[106th Congress Public Law 90]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ090.106]


[[Page 113 STAT. 1307]]

Public Law 106-90
106th Congress

                            Joint Resolution


 
To grant the consent of Congress to the boundary change between Georgia 
      and South Carolina. <<NOTE: Nov. 8, 1999 -  [H.J. Res. 62]>> 

    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. CONSENT OF THE CONGRESS.

    (a) In General.--The consent of the Congress is given to the 
establishment of the boundary between the States of Georgia and South 
Carolina.
    (b) New Boundary.--The boundary referred to in subsection (a) is the 
boundary--
            (1) agreed to by the State of Georgia in Act Number 1044 
        (S.B. No. 572) approved by the Governor on April 5, 1994, and 
        agreed to by the State of South Carolina in Act Number 375 (S.B. 
        No. 1315) approved by the Governor on May 29, 1996;
            (2) agreed to by the State of Georgia in Act Number 1044 
        (S.B. No. 572) approved by the Governor on April 5, 1994, and 
        agreed to by the State of South Carolina in an Act approved by 
        its Governor not later than 5 years after the date of the 
        enactment of this joint resolution;
            (3) agreed to by the State of South Carolina in Act Number 
        375 (S.B. No. 1315) approved by the Governor on May 29, 1996, 
        and agreed to by the State of Georgia in an Act approved by its 
        Governor not later than 5 years after the date of the enactment 
        of this joint resolution; or
            (4) agreed to by the States of Georgia and South Carolina in 
        Acts approved by each of their Governors not later than 5 years 
        after the date of the enactment of this joint resolution.

    (c) Compact.--The Acts referred to in subsection (b) are recognized 
by the Congress as an interstate compact pursuant to section 10 of 
article I of the United States Constitution.

    Approved November 8, 1999.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.J. Res. 62:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 106-304 (Comm. on the Judiciary).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 145 (1999):
            Sept. 21, considered and passed House.
            Oct. 26, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>

Share This Section