Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 08/04/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 08/04/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 08/04/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 08/04/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/17/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/08/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/10/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/28/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/28/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/29/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/29/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/03/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 07/19/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/17/2000