There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Commending the World War II veterans who fought in the Battle of the Bulge, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/07/1999Became Public Law No: 106-142. (TXT | PDF)
12/07/1999Signed by President.
11/30/1999Presented to President.
11/19/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14925-14926)
11/02/1999Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
10/05/1999Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 475).(text: CR H9315-9316)
09/30/1999Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 106-352, Part I.
08/05/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
12/07/1999Became Public Law No: 106-142. (TXT | PDF)
12/07/1999Signed by President.
11/30/1999HousePresented to President.
11/22/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/19/1999SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14925-14926)
11/02/1999SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/02/1999SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 371.
11/02/1999SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
10/06/1999SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
10/05/1999-1:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/05/1999-1:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 475). (text: CR H9315-9316)
10/05/1999-12:52pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9339-9340)
10/05/1999-11:10amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/05/1999-10:51amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 65.
10/05/1999-10:51amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9315-9328)
10/05/1999-10:51amHouseMr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
09/30/1999HouseHouse Committee on International Relations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 14, 1999.
09/30/1999HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 106-352, Part I.
09/23/1999HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/23/1999HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/22/1999HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/22/1999HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
08/05/1999HouseReferred to House International Relations
08/05/1999HouseReferred to House Veterans' Affairs
08/05/1999HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on International Relations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
08/05/1999HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/21/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/21/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/21/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/21/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/21/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/21/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/21/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/21/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/21/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/21/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/22/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/22/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/22/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/22/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/23/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/23/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/23/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/24/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/27/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/27/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/30/1999

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs08/05/1999 Referred to
09/22/1999 Markup by
09/30/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-352
House International Relations08/05/1999 Referred to
09/23/1999 Markup by
Senate Judiciary10/06/1999 Referred to
11/02/1999 Markup by
11/02/1999 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.J.Res.65. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/05/1999)

Commends the veterans of the United States Army, the British Army, and military forces of other Allied nations who fought during World War II in the German Ardennes offensive known as the Battle of the Bulge.

Honors those who gave their lives during that battle.

Authorizes the President to issue a proclamation calling upon the people of the United States to honor the veterans of the Battle of the Bulge with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.

Calls upon the President to reaffirm the bonds of friendship between the United States and both Belgium and Luxembourg.