Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/21/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/21/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/21/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/21/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/21/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/21/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/21/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/21/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/21/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/21/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/22/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/22/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/22/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/22/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/23/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/23/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/23/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/24/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/27/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/27/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/30/1999