Text: H.J.Res.72 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 106-288 (10/10/2000)

 
[106th Congress Public Law 288]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ288.106]


[[Page 114 STAT. 919]]

Public Law 106-288
106th Congress

                            Joint Resolution


 
     Granting the consent of the Congress to the Red River Boundary 
           Compact. <<NOTE: Oct. 10, 2000 -  [H.J. Res. 72]>> 

    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Texas. Oklahoma.>> 

SECTION 1. CONGRESSIONAL CONSENT.

    (a) In General.--The consent of Congress is given to the Red River 
Compact entered into between the States of Texas and Oklahoma and the 
new boundary established by the compact.
    (b) New Compact.--The compact referred to in subsection (a) sets the 
boundary between the States of Texas and Oklahoma as the vegetation line 
on the south bank of the Red River (except for the Texoma area where the 
boundary is established pursuant to procedures provided for in the 
compact) and is the compact--
            (1) agreed to by the State of Texas in House Bill 1355 
        approved by the Governor of Texas on May 24, 1999; and
            (2) agreed to by the State of Oklahoma in Senate Bill 175 
        approved by the Governor of Oklahoma on June 4, 1999.

    (c) Compact.--The Acts referred to in subsection (b) are recognized 
by Congress as an interstate compact pursuant to section 10 of Article I 
of the United States Constitution.
    (d) Construction.--The compact shall not in any manner alter--
            (1) any present or future rights and interests of the Kiowa, 
        Comanche, and Apache Tribes, the Chickasaw Nation, and the 
        Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma and their members or Indian 
        successors-in interest;
            (2) any tribal trust lands;
            (3) allotted lands that may be held in trust or lands 
        subject to a Federal restriction against alienation;
            (4) any boundaries of lands owned by the tribes and nations 
        referred to in paragraph (1), including lands referred to in 
        paragraphs (2) and (3), that exist now or that may be 
        established in the future under Federal law; and
            (5) the sovereign rights, jurisdiction, or other 
        governmental interests of the Kiowa, Comanche, and Apache 
        Tribes, the Chickasaw Nation, and the Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma 
        and their members or Indian successors-in interest presently 
        existing or which may be acknowledged by Federal and tribal law.

SEC. 2. EFFECTIVE DATE.

    This joint resolution shall take effect on August 31, 2000.

    Approved October 10, 2000.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.J. Res. 72:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 106-770 (Comm. on the Judiciary).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 146 (2000):
            July 24, considered and passed House.
            Sept. 26, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>