Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/10/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/15/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 11/15/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/15/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 11/16/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/17/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/17/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/17/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/17/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/17/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/18/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/18/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/18/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/02/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 02/02/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/08/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/10/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/08/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/10/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/19/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 06/26/2000