Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/04/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/04/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/04/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/04/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/04/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/04/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/10/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/10/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/10/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/10/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/10/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/24/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/24/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/24/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/04/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/10/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/10/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/10/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/10/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/17/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/17/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/13/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/13/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/16/2000