Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/12/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/10/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/10/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/10/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/16/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/16/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/16/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/19/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/19/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/22/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/22/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/22/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/22/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/23/2000