Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/10/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/10/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/10/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/10/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/10/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/16/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/16/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/16/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/23/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/23/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/23/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/23/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/24/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/24/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/24/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/24/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/24/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/24/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/24/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/24/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/25/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/12/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/12/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/12/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/14/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/14/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/29/1999