Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/25/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/25/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/25/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/25/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/25/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/14/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/14/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/14/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/14/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/14/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/14/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/14/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/27/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/27/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/27/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/27/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/27/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/27/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/12/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/12/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/12/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/12/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/12/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/17/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/17/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/17/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/23/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/12/2000