Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/27/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/27/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/27/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/28/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/28/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/04/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/04/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/04/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/11/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/20/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/10/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/10/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/23/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/23/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/23/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/23/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/23/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/23/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/23/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/23/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/23/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/23/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/23/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/23/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/23/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/23/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/23/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/23/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/23/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/23/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/23/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/23/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/23/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/23/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/23/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/25/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/25/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/30/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/30/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/27/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/31/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 02/03/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/15/2000
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/21/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/22/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/28/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/16/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/18/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/19/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/19/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/25/2000