Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/03/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/03/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/03/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/03/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/03/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/03/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/03/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/09/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/09/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/17/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/12/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/07/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/16/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/15/2000