Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/23/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/24/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/24/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/12/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/12/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/12/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/16/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/16/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/16/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/16/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/16/1999