Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/21/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/04/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/04/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/22/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/12/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/12/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/13/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/20/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/20/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/20/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/26/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/26/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/26/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/27/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/27/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/27/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/04/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/04/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/04/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/10/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/10/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/10/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/10/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/16/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/16/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/17/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/30/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/30/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/06/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/13/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/13/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/06/2000