Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/01/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 07/01/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 07/01/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/27/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/27/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/05/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 08/05/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/14/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/26/1999