Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/30/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 07/30/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 07/30/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 07/30/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/30/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/23/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/23/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/23/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/23/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/27/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/27/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/27/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/12/1999