Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 08/05/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 08/05/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/21/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/21/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 09/21/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/21/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/21/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/21/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/21/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/21/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/21/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/21/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/21/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/21/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/21/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/21/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/21/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/21/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/21/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/21/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/29/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/29/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/29/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/29/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/29/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/29/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/29/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/29/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/29/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/29/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/29/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/29/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/29/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/29/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/29/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/29/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/29/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/29/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/29/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/29/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/29/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/29/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/29/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/29/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/29/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/29/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/29/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/29/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/29/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/29/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/29/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/29/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/29/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/29/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/29/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/29/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/29/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/29/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/29/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/29/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/29/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/29/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/29/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/29/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/29/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/29/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/04/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/04/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/04/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/04/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/04/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/04/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/04/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/04/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/12/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/12/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/12/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/12/1999