Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/27/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/27/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/27/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/27/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/27/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/27/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/27/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 09/27/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/28/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/28/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/28/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/28/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/28/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/30/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/30/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/30/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/30/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/30/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/30/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/30/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/30/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/30/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/30/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/30/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/30/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/01/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 10/01/1999
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/01/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/01/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 10/04/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/04/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/04/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/04/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/04/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/04/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/04/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/04/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/05/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 10/05/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/06/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/06/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/07/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/07/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/07/1999