Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 10/07/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 10/07/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/07/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/14/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/14/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/18/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/18/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/19/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/19/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/19/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/19/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/20/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/20/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/20/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/21/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/21/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 10/21/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/21/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/21/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/21/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/25/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/25/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/25/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/25/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/25/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/25/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/25/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/25/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/25/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/25/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/25/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 10/25/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/25/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/25/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/25/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/25/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/25/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/25/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/25/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/25/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/25/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/25/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/25/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/25/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/25/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/25/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/25/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/25/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/25/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/25/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/25/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/25/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/25/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/25/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/25/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/25/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/25/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/25/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/25/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/25/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/25/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/25/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/25/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/25/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/25/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/25/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/25/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/25/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/25/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/25/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/27/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/27/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/27/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/27/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/27/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/27/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/27/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/27/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/27/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/27/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/27/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/27/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/27/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/27/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/27/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/27/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/27/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/27/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/27/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/28/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/01/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 11/01/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/01/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/01/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/01/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/01/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/02/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/03/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/04/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/04/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/05/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/08/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/08/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/15/1999