Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 10/28/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 10/28/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/28/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/02/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/02/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/02/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/02/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/02/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/02/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/02/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/02/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/04/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/04/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/04/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/04/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/04/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/08/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/08/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/08/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/08/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/08/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/18/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/27/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/27/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/27/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/01/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/01/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/14/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/14/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/14/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/23/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/16/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/16/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/16/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/09/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/15/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/27/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/12/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/25/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/12/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/12/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/12/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/12/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/12/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/13/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/14/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/14/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/20/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/27/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/03/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/05/2000