Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/02/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/10/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/10/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/10/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/10/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/10/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/10/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/10/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/10/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/10/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/10/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/10/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/10/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/10/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/10/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/10/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/10/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/10/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/10/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/10/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/10/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/10/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/10/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/10/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/10/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/10/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/10/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/10/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/10/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/10/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/10/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/10/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/10/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/10/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/10/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/10/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/10/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/10/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/10/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/10/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 02/10/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/10/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/10/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 02/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/10/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/10/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/10/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/10/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/11/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/11/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/11/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/11/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/24/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/24/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/24/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/24/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/24/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/24/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/24/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/24/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/24/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 02/24/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/24/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/24/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/24/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/24/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/24/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/24/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/24/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/24/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/24/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/03/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/03/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/03/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/03/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/03/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/03/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/03/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/03/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/03/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/03/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/03/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/03/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/03/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/03/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/03/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/03/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/10/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/10/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/10/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/10/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/10/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/16/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/16/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/16/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/16/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/18/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/18/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/18/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/18/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/25/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/29/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/29/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/29/1999