Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 11/17/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/22/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/11/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/12/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/22/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/22/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/22/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/22/2000